This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/25/2019 at 07:40:42 (UTC).

U S ENERGY CORP vs. APEG ENERGY II LP

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 U S ENERGY CORP filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against APEG ENERGY II LP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5528

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ENERGY ONE LLC

U S ENERGY CORP

Defendants

APEG ENERGY II GP LLC

APEG ENERGY II LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HIRSCH, MICHAEL A.

109 N Post Oak

Houston, TX 77024

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temp.

03/01/2019: Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temp.

Order Appointing Receiver for Limited Purpose

03/01/2019: Order Appointing Receiver for Limited Purpose

Exhibit 9 - Pledge Amendment 08-11-16

03/01/2019: Exhibit 9 - Pledge Amendment 08-11-16

Exhibit 4 - First Amendment to Credit Agreement 04-10-12

03/01/2019: Exhibit 4 - First Amendment to Credit Agreement 04-10-12

Exhibit 3 - Mortgage, Deed of Trust & Financing Statement 07-30-10

03/01/2019: Exhibit 3 - Mortgage, Deed of Trust & Financing Statement 07-30-10

Exhibit 20 - US Energy Corp. Projected Financial Statements

03/01/2019: Exhibit 20 - US Energy Corp. Projected Financial Statements

Exhibit 2 - Guaranty and Pledge Agreement 7-30-10

03/01/2019: Exhibit 2 - Guaranty and Pledge Agreement 7-30-10

Exhibit 19 - February 26, 2019 letter (Tacey)

03/01/2019: Exhibit 19 - February 26, 2019 letter (Tacey)

Exhibit 17 - APEG Energy II Ltr. to K. Witt 022219

03/01/2019: Exhibit 17 - APEG Energy II Ltr. to K. Witt 022219

Exhibit 16 - 2019-02-20 LTR [Witt to Tacey] re Purported Notice of Default from APEG.PDF

03/01/2019: Exhibit 16 - 2019-02-20 LTR [Witt to Tacey] re Purported Notice of Default from APEG.PDF

Exhibit 15 - Notice of Default 022019

03/01/2019: Exhibit 15 - Notice of Default 022019

Exhibit 12 - 2019-02-14 Ltr from APEG Energy II (cc KSW via FedX)

03/01/2019: Exhibit 12 - 2019-02-14 Ltr from APEG Energy II (cc KSW via FedX)

Exhibit 11 - Exchange Agreement

03/01/2019: Exhibit 11 - Exchange Agreement

Exhibit 10 - Fifth Amendment to Credit Agreement 06-28-17 (Ex 10.1 to 10-Q)

03/01/2019: Exhibit 10 - Fifth Amendment to Credit Agreement 06-28-17 (Ex 10.1 to 10-Q)

Exhibit 1 - Credit Agreement 07-30-10

03/01/2019: Exhibit 1 - Credit Agreement 07-30-10

Affidavit of David Veltri in Support of Application for TRO

03/01/2019: Affidavit of David Veltri in Support of Application for TRO

Defendants' Notice of Filing - Exhibit

03/04/2019: Defendants' Notice of Filing - Exhibit

Defendants' Notice of Filing

03/04/2019: Defendants' Notice of Filing

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • Description: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/1/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/1/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HIRSCH, MICHAEL A.; Person Filing: ENERGY ONE LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HIRSCH, MICHAEL A.; Person Filing: U S ENERGY CORP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 3/1/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less