This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:06:29 (UTC).

U S BANCORP EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC (SUCCE vs. PRIME CARE AMBULANCE SERVICE INC

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 U S BANCORP EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC SUCCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRIME CARE AMBULANCE SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7539

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S BANCORP EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC (SUCCESSOR TO FIRSTAR EQUIPMENT

Defendant

CUNEO, KEVIN J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARDWICK, HENRY LEE

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTS, MARK EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ENTRY OF TEMPORARY ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2008
  • ORDER SGND GRANTING SALE OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2005
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2005
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2005
  • FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2005
  • INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2005
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROBERTS, MARK EDWARD Person Filing - CUNEO, KEVIN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2004
  • ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING APPL FOR WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HARDWICK, HENRY LEE Person Filing - U S BANCORP EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC (SUCCESSOR TO FIRSTAR EQUIPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less