This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/28/2019 at 07:20:37 (UTC).

TYLER, JUNIPER T vs. WELLS FARGO N A ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 TYLER, JUNIPER T filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WELLS FARGO N A. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R K SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5681

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R K SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYLER, JUNIPER T

Houston, TX 77004

Defendants

BONIAL & ASSOCIATES P C ET AL (FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION )

14841 Dallas Parkway Suite 425

Dallas, TX 75254

WELLS FARGO N A ET AL

Fort Mill, SC 29715

WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

Others

WELLS FARGO NA ET AL BY SERVING SECRETARY OF STATE OF TEXAS

Fort Mill, SC 29715

WELLS FARGO & COMPANY BY SERVING

420 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HOODA, SAMIR PYARALI

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Tracking # 7018 1130 0002 1905 7050

03/07/2019: Certified Mail Tracking # 7018 1130 0002 1905 7050

Certified Mail Receipt

03/12/2019: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

03/12/2019: Certified Mail Receipt

Bonial & Associates PC's Original Answer

03/14/2019: Bonial & Associates PC's Original Answer

Exhibit B

03/15/2019: Exhibit B

Amended Original Petition and Request for Disclosures and Emergency Injunction

03/15/2019: Amended Original Petition and Request for Disclosures and Emergency Injunction

Domestic Return Receipt

03/18/2019: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

03/18/2019: Domestic Return Receipt

Statement Of Inability To Afford Payment Of Court Cost

03/19/2019: Statement Of Inability To Afford Payment Of Court Cost

Exhibit B

03/19/2019: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

03/19/2019: Exhibit A

2nd Amended Original Petition And Request For Disclosures And Emergency Injunction

03/19/2019: 2nd Amended Original Petition And Request For Disclosures And Emergency Injunction

Notice of Setting

03/19/2019: Notice of Setting

Certified Mail Tracking # 7018 1130 0002 1906 2337

03/22/2019: Certified Mail Tracking # 7018 1130 0002 1906 2337

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

03/04/2019: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Request For Issuance OF Service

03/04/2019: Request For Issuance OF Service

01. Exhibit B

03/04/2019: 01. Exhibit B

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

03/05/2019: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • Description: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: TYLER, JUNIPER T;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOODA, SAMIR PYARALI; Person Filing: BONIAL & ASSOCIATES P C ET AL (FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION );

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/4/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/4/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: TYLER, JUNIPER T;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 3/4/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less