This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/23/2021 at 07:50:52 (UTC).

TYLER, DOUGLAS vs. MERITOR INC

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 TYLER, DOUGLAS filed an Other lawsuit against MERITOR INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3520

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYLER, DOUGLAS

Defendants

ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC

MERITOR INC

FONTAINE COMMERCIAL TRAILER, INC.

DEFENDANT MERITOR, INC. F/K/A ARVINMERITOR, INC. (MERITOR)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

TIPPETTS, DAVID RICHARD

KUGLER, LAURA ELLIS

MARSHALL, HOLLINGSWORTH BARRET JR.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT B

12/30/2020: EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT A

12/30/2020: EXHIBIT A

NOTICE OF TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13 OF TAG ALONG CASE

12/30/2020: NOTICE OF TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13 OF TAG ALONG CASE

Defendant Meritor Inc.'s f/k/a Arvinmeritor, INC.'S Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claim, and Answer to Cross-Claims

12/31/2020: Defendant Meritor Inc.'s f/k/a Arvinmeritor, INC.'S Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claim, and Answer to Cross-Claims

Defendant ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC F/K/A TRW Automovie U.S. LLC'S Answer To Plaintiffs' Original Petition

01/07/2021: Defendant ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC F/K/A TRW Automovie U.S. LLC'S Answer To Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Defendant Fontaine Commercial Trailer, INC.'S Original Answer Subject To Its Motion To Transfer Venue

01/07/2021: Defendant Fontaine Commercial Trailer, INC.'S Original Answer Subject To Its Motion To Transfer Venue

Tyler, Douglas - Dr. Staggs Expert Report - APPROVED

01/19/2021: Tyler, Douglas - Dr. Staggs Expert Report - APPROVED

Notification of Service of Medical Reports Complying With 90.003 or 90.010(f)(1)

01/19/2021: Notification of Service of Medical Reports Complying With 90.003 or 90.010(f)(1)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KUGLER, LAURA ELLIS; Person Filing: FONTAINE COMMERCIAL TRAILER, INC.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TIPPETTS, DAVID RICHARD; Person Filing: ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MARSHALL, HOLLINGSWORTH BARRET JR.; Person Filing: DEFENDANT MERITOR, INC. F/K/A ARVINMERITOR, INC. (MERITOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: TYLER, DOUGLAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MERITOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIPPETTS , DAVID R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUGLER, LAURA ELLIS