This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/20/2020 at 01:04:55 (UTC).

TUTTLE, SHERYL LYNN vs. TUTTLE, JAMES BRYCE

Case Summary

On 08/24/2015 TUTTLE, SHERYL LYNN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TUTTLE, JAMES BRYCE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GERMAINE TANNER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9397

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GERMAINE TANNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TUTTLE, SHERYL LYNN

Defendant

TUTTLE, JAMES BRYCE

Other

HOERBIGER SERVICE INC

3350 Gateway Dr Pompano

Beach, FL 33069

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE TO EMPLOYER-ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES; Status: SERVICE RETURNED; Instrument: MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT OF INCOME; Person: HOERBIGER SERVICE INC; Issued: 11/5/2015; Returned: 2/17/2016; Received: 2/17/2016; Tracking: 82449474; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTESTED WAIVER DIVORCE; Order Signed: 10/30/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME; Order Signed: 10/30/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketDescription: FOCAS PROJECT - IN; Order Signed: 10/30/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES; Order Signed: 10/30/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketDescription: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT; Order Signed: 10/30/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER CITATION; Person Filing: TUTTLE, JAMES BRYCE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: TUTTLE, SHERYL LYNN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hoerbiger Service Inc. is a litigant