This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/23/2016 at 16:00:14 (UTC).

TUROFF, LUCY vs. MILLIKEN, KATHERINE

Case Summary

On 03/15/2016 TUROFF, LUCY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MILLIKEN, KATHERINE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRENT GAMBLE. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6699

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRENT GAMBLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TUROFF, LUCY

Houston, TX 77007

Defendants

MULHALL, CHARLES

Houston, TX 77061

MILLIKEN, KATHERINE (AKA KATHERINE MULHALL)

Houston, TX 77061

MILLIKEN, KATHERINE

Houston, TX 77061

MULHALL, KATHERINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEST, MICHAEL DAVID

Defendant Attorney

WRIGHT, LENNON C.

 

Court Documents

Exhibit D

03/15/2016: Exhibit D

Exhibit B

03/15/2016: Exhibit B

Direct Questions to Be Propounded to the Witness

04/12/2016: Direct Questions to Be Propounded to the Witness

Proposed Order

06/29/2016: Proposed Order

Exhibit B

06/29/2016: Exhibit B

Defendant's Motion for Removal from Expedited Action Process and New Docket Control Order

06/29/2016: Defendant's Motion for Removal from Expedited Action Process and New Docket Control Order

Exhibit A

07/26/2016: Exhibit A

Exhibit 01-B

10/14/2016: Exhibit 01-B

Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Traditional and Defendants' Motion for Traditional and No-Evidence Summary Judgment

10/14/2016: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Traditional and Defendants' Motion for Traditional and No-Evidence Summary Judgment

Proposed Order

11/02/2016: Proposed Order

Unopposed Objection to Mediation

11/02/2016: Unopposed Objection to Mediation

Amended Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

11/07/2016: Amended Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

11/07/2016: Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

Proposed Order

11/08/2016: Proposed Order

Defendants Objection to Plaintiffs Typographical Correction and Motion to Strike

12/02/2016: Defendants Objection to Plaintiffs Typographical Correction and Motion to Strike

Proposed Order

12/07/2016: Proposed Order

Notice of Oral Hearing

12/09/2016: Notice of Oral Hearing

Exhibit B-5

12/09/2016: Exhibit B-5

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL; Order Signed: 11/29/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 11/14/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING OBJECTION TO MEDIATION; Order Signed: 11/14/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Description: SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FIRST AMENDED PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEST, MICHAEL DAVID; Person Filing: TUROFF, LUCY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Description: ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED; Order Signed: 8/29/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Description: ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED; Order Signed: 8/22/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 8/22/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL; Order Signed: 8/19/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Order Signed: 7/29/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEST, MICHAEL DAVID; Person Filing: TUROFF, LUCY;

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRIMM, CHRISTOPHER ALAN; Person Filing: MILLIKEN, KATHERINE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRIMM, CHRISTOPHER ALAN; Person Filing: MULHALL, CHARLES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/18/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Description: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/18/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 3/15/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEST, MICHAEL DAVID; Person Filing: TUROFF, LUCY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/15/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/15/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less