This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:05:53 (UTC).

TURCIOS, ELSA MARINA LUNA vs. TURCIOS, HECTOR MANUEL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 TURCIOS, ELSA MARINA LUNA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TURCIOS, HECTOR MANUEL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0370

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

TURCIOS, ELSA MARINA LUNA

TURCIOS, HECTOR MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CORREA, CARLOS L.

BENAVIDES, ANTONIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2005
  • ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • SETTLED/NON-SUITED (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - BENAVIDES, ANTONIO Person Filing - TURCIOS, HECTOR MANUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CORREA, CARLOS L. Person Filing - TURCIOS, ELSA MARINA LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - BENAVIDES, ANTONIO Person Filing - TURCIOS, HECTOR MANUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BENAVIDES, ANTONIO Person Filing - TURCIOS, HECTOR MANUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CORREA, CARLOS L. Person Filing - TURCIOS, ELSA MARINA LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less