This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 08:18:32 (UTC).

TSENG, JAO HAUNG vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 TSENG, JAO HAUNG filed an Other lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9972

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSENG, JAO HAUNG

Defendants

OCA EXPUNCTIONS - LEGAL DIVISION

BELLAIRE POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAVINOV, PAVEL

10333 Harwin Dri

Houston, TX 77036

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order Setting Hearing:

07/13/2020: Proposed Order Setting Hearing:

Proposed Order Setting Hearing for Expunction

07/14/2020: Proposed Order Setting Hearing for Expunction

ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

07/16/2020: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

Original Petition for Expunction of Criminal Records

07/06/2020: Original Petition for Expunction of Criminal Records

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • HearingCourt: 295; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/16/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SAVINOV, PAVEL; Person Filing: TSENG, JAO HAUNG;

    Read MoreRead Less