This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:10:20 (UTC).

TRIMM, SUSI (IND AND DBA TRIMM & ASSOCIATES INC) vs. HERMAN, SHERRI (IND AND DBA HERMAN GP LLC)

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 TRIMM, SUSI IND AND DBA TRIMM ASSOCIATES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HERMAN, SHERRI IND AND DBA HERMAN GP LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8395

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRIMM, SUSI

TRIMM & ASSOCIATES INC

Defendants

HERMAN, SHERRI

HERMAN GP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COSTEA, PETER

Defendant Attorney

GARRIGAN, DANIEL P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2010
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • SETTLED/NON-SUITED (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COSTEA, PETER Person Filing - TRIMM, SUSI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COSTEA, PETER Person Filing - TRIMM, SUSI (IND AND DBA TRIMM & ASSOCIATES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • SECOND AMENDED ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETIT : Filing Attorney - GARRIGAN, DANIEL P. Person Filing - HERMAN, SHERRI (IND AND DBA HERMAN GP LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARRIGAN, DANIEL P. Person Filing - HERMAN, SHERRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARRIGAN, DANIEL P. Person Filing - HERMAN, SHERRI (IND AND DBA HERMAN GP LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARRIGAN, DANIEL P. Person Filing - HERMAN GP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COSTEA, PETER Person Filing - TRIMM, SUSI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COSTEA, PETER Person Filing - TRIMM, SUSI (IND AND DBA TRIMM & ASSOCIATES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less