This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:08:30 (UTC).

TRAMELL, RAYMOND T vs. NAJERA, HUMBERTO

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 TRAMELL, RAYMOND T filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NAJERA, HUMBERTO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7552

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAMELL, RAYMOND T

Defendant

NAJERA, HUMBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SECHELSKI, LISA LYNETTE HOPKINS

Defendant Attorney

SOULE, BETHANY RENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKINNEY, DAGNEE BAVIER Person Filing - TRAMELL, RAYMOND T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2004
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2004
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SOULE, BETHANY RENE Person Filing - NAJERA, HUMBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GONZALES, MANUEL Person Filing - TRAMELL, RAYMOND T

    Read MoreRead Less