This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/05/2021 at 07:24:06 (UTC).

TORRES, WILMA (IANF OF AXXXX GXXXXXX CXXX AND OXXX RXXXX) vs. SORENSEN, BRECK ALAN

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 TORRES, WILMA IANF OF AXXXX GXXXXXX CXXX AND OXXX RXXXX filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SORENSEN, BRECK ALAN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6610

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TORRES, WILMA (IANF OF AXXXX GXXXXXX CXXX AND OXXX RXXXX)

CXXX, AXXXX GXXXXXX

RXXXX, OXXX

Defendants

SORENSEN, BRECK ALAN

Conroe, TX 77303

ROYAL CUP INC

Other

ROYAL CUP INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION)

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VU, VINCENT T.

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request

10/12/2021: Civil Process Request

Citation Return

10/19/2021: Citation Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ROYAL CUP INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION); Issued: 10/13/2021; Served: 10/15/2021; Tracking: 73927082; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SORENSEN, BRECK ALAN; Issued: 10/13/2021; Tracking: 73927078; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: VU, VINCENT T.; Person Filing: CXXX, AXXXX GXXXXXX;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: VU, VINCENT T.; Person Filing: RXXXX, OXXX;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: VU, VINCENT T.; Person Filing: TORRES, WILMA (IANF OF AXXXX GXXXXXX CXXX AND OXXX RXXXX);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL CUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VU, VINCENT T.