This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/25/2016 at 09:07:32 (UTC).

TORRES-CRUZ, PATRICIA vs. TORRES-BARRE, LAURA (M D)

Case Summary

On 01/07/2016 TORRES-CRUZ, PATRICIA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TORRES-BARRE, LAURA M D. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GRANT DORFMAN. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0979

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GRANT DORFMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES-CRUZ, PATRICIA

Defendants

ARPON, MARIA C (R N)

EKO, GABRIELLE (R N)

GELBER, DAVID (M D)

SICKOREZ, SANDRA (R N)

SHEEHAN, PAUL M (M D)

WEINBERG, JOHN K (M D)

MEMORIAL HERMANN SOUTHEAST HOSPITAL

MEMORIAL HERMANN HOSPITAL SYSTEM

PRANGE, BRYAN T (M D)

MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM D/B/A MEMORIAL HERMANN SOUTHEAST

GARZA, EZEQUIEL (R N)

TORRES-BARRE, LAURA (M D)

CHAWLA, MUNISH (M D)

Other

MEMRORIAL HERMANN HOSPITAL SYSTEM (D/B/A MEMORIAL HERMANN SOUTHEAST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEL, COREY SCOTT

Defendant Attorneys

LAW, RICHARD M.

DOYLE, FRANK A.

BOSTON, JAMES R. JR.

MADDEN, TAMARA M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request Form

01/07/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Defendant Paul M. Sheehan, MD's Original Answer and Jury Demand

03/16/2016: Defendant Paul M. Sheehan, MD's Original Answer and Jury Demand

DEFENDANT JOHN K. WEINBERG, M.D.'S ORIGINAL ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND:

03/29/2016: DEFENDANT JOHN K. WEINBERG, M.D.'S ORIGINAL ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND:

Exhibit B

05/06/2016: Exhibit B

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT REPORT AND C.V

05/06/2016: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT REPORT AND C.V

Proposed Order

05/24/2016: Proposed Order

DEFENDANTS', MEMORIAL HERMANN HOSPITAL SYSTEM DBA MEMORIAL HERMANN SOUTHEAST HOSPITAL, MARIA C. ARPON, R.N., EXEQUIEL GARZA, R.N. AND SANDRA SICKOREZ, R.N. OBJECTIONS T OAND MOTION CHALLENGING ADEQUACY OF PLAINTIFF'S CHAPTER 74 EXPERT REPORTS OF MARC PROB

05/24/2016: DEFENDANTS', MEMORIAL HERMANN HOSPITAL SYSTEM DBA MEMORIAL HERMANN SOUTHEAST HOSPITAL, MARIA C. ARPON, R.N., EXEQUIEL GARZA, R.N. AND SANDRA SICKOREZ, R.N. OBJECTIONS T OAND MOTION CHALLENGING ADEQUACY OF PLAINTIFF'S CHAPTER 74 EXPERT REPORTS OF MARC PROB

Certificate of Service

05/26/2016: Certificate of Service

Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

05/26/2016: Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

05/26/2016: Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

Filing Letter

05/26/2016: Filing Letter

Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

05/26/2016: Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

05/26/2016: Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

05/27/2016: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

05/27/2016: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

Proposed Order

07/27/2016: Proposed Order

Notice of Oral Hearing:

09/13/2016: Notice of Oral Hearing:

First Amended Notice of Oral Hearing:

10/27/2016: First Amended Notice of Oral Hearing:

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2016
  • Description: SEVERANCE ORDER SIGNED, PARTY REMOVED; Order Signed: 9/28/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GOMEL, COREY SCOTT; Person Filing: TORRES-CRUZ, PATRICIA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Description: MOTION FOR SEVERANCE GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Description: SEVERANCE ORDER SIGNED, PARTY REMOVED; Order Signed: 8/3/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAW, RICHARD M.; Person Filing: MEMORIAL HERMANN SOUTHEAST HOSPITAL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAW, RICHARD M.; Person Filing: MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM D/B/A MEMORIAL HERMANN SOUTHEAST;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAW, RICHARD M.; Person Filing: MEMORIAL HERMANN HOSPITAL SYSTEM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/2/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOSTON, JAMES R. JR.; Person Filing: PRANGE, BRYAN T (M D);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GOMEL, COREY SCOTT; Person Filing: TORRES-CRUZ, PATRICIA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.