This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/19/2023 at 07:24:06 (UTC).

TIEL WAY PROPERTIES LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 TIEL WAY PROPERTIES LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5218

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIEL WAY PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVING THE CHIRF APPRAISER OF THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUCKERS, SARAH ANN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

01/26/2023: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation

02/13/2023: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVING THE CHIRF APPRAISER OF THE; Issued: 1/27/2023; Served: 2/10/2023; Returned: 2/10/2023; Received: 2/13/2023; Tracking: 74104229; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DUCKERS, SARAH ANN; Person Filing: TIEL WAY PROPERTIES LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less