Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/18/2015 at 13:49:06 (UTC).

THOMPSON, ALLEN E L vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 10/04/2005 THOMPSON, ALLEN E L filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3746

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THOMPSON, ALLEN E L

THOMPSON, BERNICE

TURNER, KIMBERLY (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

THOMPSON, MARK A (SON OF DECEDENT ALLEN E L THOMPSON)

TURNER, KIMBERLY JO

TURNER, KIMBERLY (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE

Defendants

A W CHESTERTON

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC_(INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-

DANA CORPORATION

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION

T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION L L C (FKA THOMPSON-HAYWARD CHEMICAL

THOMPSON-HAYWARD CHEMICAL COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION_(INDIVIDUALLY AND F/K/A UNION CARBIDE

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

ELLISTON, GARY D.

BIRGE, ERIC R.

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

WHITE, CLAY M.

FOLEY, JAMES THOMAS III

REYNARD, DAVID D. JR.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

LOFTIN, STEPHEN MCBRIDE

Other Attorneys

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

FRASE, LAURA ANN

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

LYNN, LAWRENCE A.

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

MAGUIRE, KEVIN J.

OLIVER, DAVID ARTHUR JR.

FULLER, L. HAYES III

FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD

POFF, FRANKLIN ALBRIGHT JR.

5 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MAGUIRE, KEVIN J. Person Filing - GOODRICH CORPORATION_(INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MOIR, PETER A. Person Filing - OWENS-ILLINOIS INC_(INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO OWENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID Person Filing - GEORGE-PACIFIC CORPORATION_(INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CLAY M. Person Filing - CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CLAY M. Person Filing - AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLIZZARD, JOSEPH Person Filing - RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION_(FKA GLEN ALDEN CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FULLER, L. HAYES III Person Filing - GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - THOMPSON, ALLEN E L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - THOMPSON, BERNICE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AQUA-CHEM INC. is a litigant