This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 07:34:34 (UTC).

THE WRONGFUL DEATH BENEFICIARIES OF THE ESTATE OF RAYMOND RILES II vs. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 THE WRONGFUL DEATH BENEFICIARIES OF THE ESTATE OF RAYMOND RILES II filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3729

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE WRONGFUL DEATH BENEFICIARIES OF THE ESTATE OF RAYMOND RILES II

WOOTEN, BERNICE

RILES, RAYMOND

RILES, JOSHUA

MAXWELL, TREVON

RILES, RAYMOND (III)

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

DOE, JOHN

Others

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

1999 Bryan St Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

2500 Lou Menk Drive Fort

Worth, TX 76131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMMACK, BRANDON RAYMOND

Defendant Attorney

BURNS, ROBERT B. JR.

 

Court Documents

cpr Union Pacific

07/22/2022: cpr Union Pacific

cpr BNSF

07/22/2022: cpr BNSF

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Rule 193.7 Notice

07/21/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Rule 193.7 Notice

Defendant BNSF Railway Company's Original Answer

08/02/2022: Defendant BNSF Railway Company's Original Answer

Citation Return

07/28/2022: Citation Return

Citation Return

07/28/2022: Citation Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURNS, ROBERT B. JR.; Person Filing: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 7/22/2022; Served: 7/26/2022; Tracking: 74029609; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 7/22/2022; Served: 7/27/2022; Tracking: 74029607; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CAMMACK, BRANDON RAYMOND; Person Filing: RILES, RAYMOND (III);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CAMMACK, BRANDON RAYMOND; Person Filing: RILES, JOSHUA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CAMMACK, BRANDON RAYMOND; Person Filing: MAXWELL, TREVON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CAMMACK, BRANDON RAYMOND; Person Filing: RILES, RAYMOND;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CAMMACK, BRANDON RAYMOND; Person Filing: THE WRONGFUL DEATH BENEFICIARIES OF THE ESTATE OF RAYMOND RILES II;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CAMMACK, BRANDON RAYMOND; Person Filing: WOOTEN, BERNICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases where BNSF Railway Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS ROBERT B.