This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/22/2021 at 08:22:14 (UTC).

THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1607

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

Defendant and Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TORIGIAN, JOHN S.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order, Jury Demand, and Requests for Disclosure

10/29/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order, Jury Demand, and Requests for Disclosure

Exhibit 01

10/29/2021: Exhibit 01

Exhibit 02

10/29/2021: Exhibit 02

Request for Issuance of Service

10/29/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order, Jury Demand, And Request for Disclosure

11/12/2021: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order, Jury Demand, And Request for Disclosure

Exhibit 2 Agreed Judgment

11/12/2021: Exhibit 2 Agreed Judgment

Exhibit 1 HCAD TAX ACCT# 0421380000022

11/12/2021: Exhibit 1 HCAD TAX ACCT# 0421380000022

Exhibit 3 HCAD TAX ACCT# 0421380000023

11/12/2021: Exhibit 3 HCAD TAX ACCT# 0421380000023

Exhibit 4 HCAD TAX ACCT# 0421380000024

11/12/2021: Exhibit 4 HCAD TAX ACCT# 0421380000024

Return of Service

11/11/2021: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TORIGIAN, JOHN S.; Person Filing: THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT; Issued: 11/2/2021; Served: 11/11/2021; Tracking: 73933904; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TORIGIAN, JOHN S.; Person Filing: THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Texas Development Company as Leasing Agent for 529 #60 Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant