This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/05/2021 at 07:34:31 (UTC).

THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6739

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TORIGIAN, JOHN S.

Defendant Attorney

OUSLANDER, COREY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

10/14/2021: Return of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order, Jury Demand, and Requests for Disclosure

10/12/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order, Jury Demand, and Requests for Disclosure

EXHIBIT 01

10/12/2021: EXHIBIT 01

EXHIBIT 02

10/12/2021: EXHIBIT 02

EXHIBIT 03

10/12/2021: EXHIBIT 03

Exhibit 04

10/12/2021: Exhibit 04

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

10/12/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

Defendant's Original Answer

11/03/2021: Defendant's Original Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OUSLANDER, COREY ROBERT; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 10/13/2021; Served: 10/14/2021; Tracking: 73927106; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TORIGIAN, JOHN S.; Person Filing: THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Texas Development Company as Leasing Agent for 529 #60 Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant