This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/20/2020 at 07:22:55 (UTC).

THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R. K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8918

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R. K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

Other and Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TORIGIAN, JOHN S.

Defendant Attorney

OUSLANDER, COREY R

 

Court Documents

Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

11/19/2020: Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

10/27/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT 04

10/27/2020: EXHIBIT 04

EXHIBIT 03

10/27/2020: EXHIBIT 03

EXHIBIT 02

10/27/2020: EXHIBIT 02

EXHIBIT 01

10/27/2020: EXHIBIT 01

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION FOR REVIEW OF APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD ORDER JURY DEMAND AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE

10/27/2020: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION FOR REVIEW OF APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD ORDER JURY DEMAND AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE

Return of Service

10/29/2020: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OUSLANDER, COREY R; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT; Issued: 10/28/2020; Served: 10/29/2020; Tracking: 73805535; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TORIGIAN, JOHN S.; Person Filing: THE TEXAS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Texas Development Company as Leasing Agent for 529 #60 Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Torigian, John S