Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:45:49 (UTC).

THE STATE OF TEXAS vs. AUCTIONS UNLIMITED LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 THE STATE OF TEXAS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AUCTIONS UNLIMITED LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9535

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF TEXAS

Defendant

AUCTIONS UNLIMITED LLC

Other

AUCTIONS UNLIMITED LLC (A DOMESTIC LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY

4007 Elmwood Dr

Pearland, TX 77584

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERLIN, RICHARD DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

ROEBUCK, JEFFREY T

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

04/28/2020: Return of Service

Defendant's Original Answer

05/15/2020: Defendant's Original Answer

Exhibit D

04/16/2020: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

04/16/2020: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

04/16/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

04/16/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Application for Temporary and Permanent Injunctions

04/16/2020: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Application for Temporary and Permanent Injunctions

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit C - Screen Shots

03/26/2020: Exhibit C - Screen Shots

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Charlene Gale

03/26/2020: Exhibit B - Affidavit of Charlene Gale

Exhibit A - Disaster Proclamation

03/26/2020: Exhibit A - Disaster Proclamation

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Temporary and Permanent Injunctions

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Temporary and Permanent Injunctions

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROEBUCK, JEFFREY T; Person Filing: AUCTIONS UNLIMITED LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BERLIN, RICHARD DANIEL; Person Filing: THE STATE OF TEXAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AUCTIONS UNLIMITED LLC (A DOMESTIC LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY; Issued: 3/26/2020; Served: 4/27/2020; Tracking: 73738522; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BERLIN, RICHARD DANIEL; Person Filing: THE STATE OF TEXAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less