This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 07:37:45 (UTC).

THE KROGER COMPANY vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 THE KROGER COMPANY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8073

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE KROGER COMPANY

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVEDTHROUGH ITS

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLE, KENNETH RYAN

 

Court Documents

Citation (Executed)

09/22/2021: Citation (Executed)

Plaintiff's Original Petition

09/09/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVEDTHROUGH ITS; Issued: 9/10/2021; Served: 9/20/2021; Returned: 9/21/2021; Received: 9/22/2021; Tracking: 73914489; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COLE, KENNETH RYAN; Person Filing: THE KROGER COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLE , KENNETH RYAN