This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 07:49:52 (UTC).

THE CITY OF HOUSTON vs. YACOUB, OSAMAH M

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 THE CITY OF HOUSTON filed an Other lawsuit against YACOUB, OSAMAH M. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0268

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CITY OF HOUSTON

Defendant

YACOUB, OSAMAH M

Houston, TX 77008

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK, HEATHER NOELLE

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

07/15/2020: Affidavit of Service

Exhibit A

07/07/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Original Petition for Permanent Injunction and Request for Disclosure

07/07/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition for Permanent Injunction and Request for Disclosure

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

07/07/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: YACOUB, OSAMAH M; Issued: 7/8/2020; Served: 7/10/2020; Tracking: 73764991; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COOK, HEATHER NOELLE; Person Filing: THE CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less