This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/31/2020 at 07:36:48 (UTC).

THE CHIPMONKS PARTNERSHIP LLP vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 THE CHIPMONKS PARTNERSHIP LLP filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7182

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CHIPMONKS PARTNERSHIP LLP

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALTON, GREGORY JEROME

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

08/07/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

EXHIBIT A - CHIPMONKS PARTNERSHIP

08/07/2020: EXHIBIT A - CHIPMONKS PARTNERSHIP

Request for Issuance of Service

08/07/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Citation Return

08/24/2020: Citation Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 8/7/2020; Served: 8/18/2020; Tracking: 73775004; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DALTON, GREGORY JEROME; Person Filing: THE CHIPMONKS PARTNERSHIP LLP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Chipmonks Partnership LLP dba Woodland Hills Luxury Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALTON, GREGORY JEROME