This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:12:57 (UTC).

THAMMAVONGSA, SEAN vs. WONGSA, JAROENPONG

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 THAMMAVONGSA, SEAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WONGSA, JAROENPONG. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0551

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THAMMAVONGSA, SEAN

Defendants

WONGSA, JAROENPONG

SOUCHANH, SISAMOUTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, RODNEY O'NEIL

Defendant Attorney

ROBBINS, APRIL C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2006
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2005
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROBBINS, APRIL C. Person Filing - SOUCHANH, SISAMOUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROBBINS, APRIL C. Person Filing - SOUCHANH, SISAMOUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILLIAMS, RODNEY O'NEIL Person Filing - THAMMAVONGSA, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less