This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/15/2018 at 06:56:41 (UTC).

TEXAS PETROLEUM PRODUCTS INC vs. INNOVATIVE ENERGY SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2016 TEXAS PETROLEUM PRODUCTS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INNOVATIVE ENERGY SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAN HINDE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7629

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAN HINDE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEXAS PETROLEUM PRODUCTS INC

Defendant

INNOVATIVE ENERGY SERVICES INC

Other

INNOVATIVE ENERGY SERVICES INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEERS, BRAD

Defendant Attorney

OWEN, SCOTT M.

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7015 3010 0000 6613 3482

02/05/2016: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7015 3010 0000 6613 3482

Exhibits 2-B

02/05/2016: Exhibits 2-B

Exhibits 2-A

02/05/2016: Exhibits 2-A

Civil Process Request Form

02/05/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Civil Case Information Sheet

02/05/2016: Civil Case Information Sheet

Original Petition

02/05/2016: Original Petition

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

03/30/2016: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Defendant's First Amended Answer To Plaintiff's Original Petition

12/06/2016: Defendant's First Amended Answer To Plaintiff's Original Petition

DCA Generic Letter

01/19/2017: DCA Generic Letter

Agreed Motion For Continuance

03/06/2017: Agreed Motion For Continuance

ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

03/08/2017: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

03/15/2017: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Agreed Motion for Continuance (Second)

05/19/2017: Agreed Motion for Continuance (Second)

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

06/02/2017: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

DCA Generic Letter

07/19/2017: DCA Generic Letter

Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice

09/13/2017: Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

09/28/2017: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

10/31/2017: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • Description: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/31/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Description: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 9/28/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL; Order Signed: 9/28/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Description: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/2/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/2/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 5/30/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/15/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Description: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/15/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 3/8/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Description: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 1/23/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OWEN, SCOTT M.; Person Filing: INNOVATIVE ENERGY SERVICES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Description: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/30/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/30/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OWEN, SCOTT M.; Person Filing: INNOVATIVE ENERGY SERVICES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BEERS, BRAD; Person Filing: TEXAS PETROLEUM PRODUCTS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less