This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/10/2020 at 08:08:58 (UTC).

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9088

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houstonq, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLACKWELL, MELINDA D.

 

Court Documents

Citation

08/19/2020: Citation

Plaintiffs Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order

08/17/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order

Exhibit A

08/17/2020: Exhibit A

Request for Issuance of Service

08/17/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 8/18/2020; Served: 8/19/2020; Tracking: 73777856; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLACKWELL, MELINDA D.; Person Filing: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLACKWELL, MELINDA D.; Person Filing: TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melinda D Blackwell