This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/26/2021 at 07:47:49 (UTC).

TEXAS MONOLINE LLC vs. U S WELL SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 TEXAS MONOLINE LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against U S WELL SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2043

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEXAS MONOLINE LLC

Defendant

U S WELL SERVICES LLC

Other

U S WELL SERVICES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

206 E 9Th St Ste 1300

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANKLIN, JACKY B

 

Court Documents

Ltr to Clerk - Request Service

03/15/2021: Ltr to Clerk - Request Service

Verification

03/02/2021: Verification

Exhibit B - Master Service Agreement

03/02/2021: Exhibit B - Master Service Agreement

Exhibit A - Statement of Account USWELL 2.26.2021

03/02/2021: Exhibit A - Statement of Account USWELL 2.26.2021

Original Petition for Suit On Sworn Account

03/02/2021: Original Petition for Suit On Sworn Account

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: U S WELL SERVICES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 3/15/2021; Served: 3/19/2021; Returned: 3/23/2021; Tracking: 73849917; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRANKLIN, JACKY B; Person Filing: TEXAS MONOLINE LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S WELL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANKLIN, JACKY B.