This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/26/2015 at 11:54:31 (UTC).

TEVEBAUGH, VERNON E vs. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/01/2004 TEVEBAUGH, VERNON E filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8280

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

TEVEBAUGH, VERNON E

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (FOREIGN CORPORATION)

TEVEBAUGH, VERNON EUGENE

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC (SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HAVEG INDUSTRIES INC)

ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA DB RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

DB RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION (FKA HERCULES INC) (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-

HERCULES INC

CRANE COMPANY

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC

DANA CORPORATION

FLUOR CORPORATION

FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC (DBA FLUOR DANIEL FLOUR GLOBAL SERVICES FLUOR

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S.

Defendant Attorneys

ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY

ELLISTON, GARY D.

POWERS, JAMES H.

HARRIS, RAYMOND PAUL JR.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

FOLEY, JAMES THOMAS III

ADAMS, KENT M.

Other Attorneys

SMITH, J. MICHAEL

RAMIREZ, MICHAEL JOHN

MOIR, PETER A.

HOGAN, TIMOTHY J.

SHEEHY, RICHARD A.

MOORE, RANDY EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITI : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC (DBA FLUOR DANIEL FLOUR GLOBAL SERVICES FLUOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITI : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - FLUOR CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (FOREIGN CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (FOREIGN CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC (DBA FLUOR DANIEL FLOUR GLOBAL SERVICES FLUOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - FLUOR CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MOORE, RANDY EDWARD Person Filing - U S CONTRACTORS LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - MOORE, RANDY EDWARD Person Filing - U S CONTRACTORS LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2004
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - SHEEHY, RICHARD A. Person Filing - TH AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION L L C (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO TH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHEEHY, RICHARD A. Person Filing - TH AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION L L C (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO TH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S. Person Filing - TEVEBAUGH, VERNON E

    Read MoreRead Less