Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:49:20 (UTC).

TESORO GREAT PLAINS HOLDINGS COMPANY LLC vs. GREAT NORTHERN MIDSTREAM HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 TESORO GREAT PLAINS HOLDINGS COMPANY LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GREAT NORTHERN MIDSTREAM HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN KIRKLAND and FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9574

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN KIRKLAND

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TESORO GREAT PLAINS HOLDINGS COMPANY LLC

Defendants

QUINTANA INFRASTRUCTURE & DEVELOPMENT LLC

GREAT NORTHERN MIDSTREAM HOLDING LLC

GREAT NORTHERN MIDSTREAM HOLDINGS LLC

Others

QUINTANA INFRASTRUCTURE & DEVELOPMENT LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED

206 E 9Th Street Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

GREAT NORTHERN MIDSTREAM HOLDINGS LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY

1675 South State Street Suite B

Dover, DE 19901

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTGOMERY, JOEL ZANE

712 Main Stree

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON, LOGAN ENGLISH

 

Court Documents

Defendants' Original Answer And Request For Disclosure

05/01/2020: Defendants' Original Answer And Request For Disclosure

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

05/20/2020: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

04/01/2020: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

Citation (Great Northern Midstream Holdings LLC)

04/09/2020: Citation (Great Northern Midstream Holdings LLC)

Citation-QUINTANA INFRASTRUCTURE & DEVELOPMENT LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED

04/17/2020: Citation-QUINTANA INFRASTRUCTURE & DEVELOPMENT LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit C

03/26/2020: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

03/26/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

03/26/2020: Exhibit A

Tesoro Great Plains Holdings Company LLC's Original Petition

03/26/2020: Tesoro Great Plains Holdings Company LLC's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingCourt: 061; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNSON, LOGAN ENGLISH; Person Filing: QUINTANA INFRASTRUCTURE & DEVELOPMENT LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNSON, LOGAN ENGLISH; Person Filing: GREAT NORTHERN MIDSTREAM HOLDINGS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/1/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: QUINTANA INFRASTRUCTURE & DEVELOPMENT LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED; Issued: 4/2/2020; Served: 4/7/2020; Tracking: 73740305; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GREAT NORTHERN MIDSTREAM HOLDINGS LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY; Issued: 4/2/2020; Served: 4/8/2020; Received: 4/9/2020; Tracking: 73740303; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTGOMERY, JOEL ZANE; Person Filing: TESORO GREAT PLAINS HOLDINGS COMPANY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less