This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/25/2022 at 04:40:00 (UTC).

TEAMER, CRAIG EUGENE vs. OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 TEAMER, CRAIG EUGENE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0169

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEAMER, CRAIG EUGENE

Defendants

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE- CJAD

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY CRIME RECORDS DIVISION/EXPUNCTIONS

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNIITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 9/23/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: TEAMER, CRAIG EUGENE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CSCD is a litigant

Latest cases where Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Parole Division is a litigant