Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:35:38 (UTC).

TAYLOR, ANGELA vs. PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 TAYLOR, ANGELA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9441

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR, ANGELA

Defendants

GARCIA, MARIO ALBERTO

Houston, TX 77096

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED BY

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FIROUZBAKHT, ERIC

FIROUZBAKHT, ERIC KAMRON

 

Court Documents

Citation

06/01/2020: Citation

Citation for Marco Alberto Garcia

04/06/2020: Citation for Marco Alberto Garcia

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GARCIA, MARIO ALBERTO; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 4/3/2020; Tracking: 73738559; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 6/1/2020; Tracking: 73738558; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FIROUZBAKHT, ERIC KAMRON; Person Filing: TAYLOR, ANGELA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less