This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:09:34 (UTC).

TAYLOR, ALLAN GLENN JR vs. TAYLOR, SUSAN REBECCA LEHANE

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 TAYLOR, ALLAN GLENN JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TAYLOR, SUSAN REBECCA LEHANE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8105

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR, ALLAN GLENN JR

Defendant

TAYLOR, SUSAN REBECCA LEHANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, JOHN NEAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER NOT MAILED NO ADDRESS PER 119A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • SETTLED/NON-SUITED (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2004
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2004
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ANDERSON, JOHN NEAL Person Filing - TAYLOR, ALLAN GLENN JR

    Read MoreRead Less