This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/03/2020 at 07:28:39 (UTC).

TAVERAS, GALINDA NINA vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 TAVERAS, GALINDA NINA filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6181

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAVERAS, GALINDA NINA

Houston, TX 77017

Defendants

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

PASADENA MUNICIPAL COURT

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE - CJAD

PASADENA POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingCourt: 270; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION; Requesting Party: TAVERAS, GALINDA NINA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/16/2020;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: TAVERAS, GALINDA NINA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less