This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:11:18 (UTC).

TALLEY, ELIZABETH J vs. SHANNON AUTOMOTIVE LTD (FKA GOODSON CHRY

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 TALLEY, ELIZABETH J filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against SHANNON AUTOMOTIVE LTD FKA GOODSON CHRY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8474

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TALLEY, ELIZABETH J

Defendants

SHANNON AUTOMOTIVE LTD (FKA GOODSON CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE WEST)

GOODSON CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE WEST

BANCO P

BANCO POPULAR NORTH AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASSEY, DWAINE M.

Defendant Attorney

JONES, JOHN ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JONES, JOHN ROBERT Person Filing - BANCO POPULAR NORTH AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MASSEY, DWAINE MORRIS Person Filing - TALLEY, ELIZABETH J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KNUDSEN, MEGAN LYNETTE Person Filing - SHANNON AUTOMOTIVE LTD (FKA GOODSON CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE WEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MASSEY, DWAINE MORRIS Person Filing - TALLEY, ELIZABETH J

    Read MoreRead Less