This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/21/2023 at 16:38:00 (UTC).

T4V1 LLC (DBA CASA DEL SOL APARTMENTS) BY AND THROUGH ITS ATTORNEY OF vs. VELOCITY RISK UNDERWRITERS

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 T4V1 LLC DBA CASA DEL SOL APARTMENTS BY AND THROUGH ITS ATTORNEY OF filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against VELOCITY RISK UNDERWRITERS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6861

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

T4V1 LLC (DBA CASA DEL SOL APARTMENTS) BY AND THROUGH ITS ATTORNEY OF

CASA DEL SOL APARTMENTS

Defendants

VELOCITY RISK UNDERWRITERS

INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

VELOCITY RISK UNDERWRITERS MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON, DAVID RINDLE

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMS, AUSTIN BRUCE

 

Court Documents

Defendant Independent Specialty Insurance Company's First Amended Answer

07/14/2023: Defendant Independent Specialty Insurance Company's First Amended Answer

PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

04/18/2023: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Non-Suit without Prejudice as to Defendant Velocity Risk Underwriters Only

04/14/2023: Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Non-Suit without Prejudice as to Defendant Velocity Risk Underwriters Only

Proposed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice

04/14/2023: Proposed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice

Defendant Independant Specialty Insurance Companys Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims Against Agents with Prejudice

04/06/2023: Defendant Independant Specialty Insurance Companys Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims Against Agents with Prejudice

ORDER RESETTING TRIAL

03/14/2023: ORDER RESETTING TRIAL

COURT SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED

03/13/2023: COURT SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED

Letter Regarding Rule 11 Agreement

03/10/2023: Letter Regarding Rule 11 Agreement

Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record

03/07/2023: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record

Joint Motion for Continuance and Extension of Deadlines

03/06/2023: Joint Motion for Continuance and Extension of Deadlines

Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order

03/06/2023: Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order

Notice of Appearance

03/03/2023: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

03/02/2023: Notice of Appearance

Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record

10/19/2022: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record

Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record

09/30/2022: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record

Notice of Appearance

09/22/2022: Notice of Appearance

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER-JCVO02

08/24/2022: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER-JCVO02

Defendant Independent Specialty Insurance Company's Original Answer

08/12/2022: Defendant Independent Specialty Insurance Company's Original Answer

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2023

HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR); Results: Re-Set; Comments: CONT GRANTED 3/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketDescription: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 4/18/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: DISMISS (MOTION TO); Results: Passed; Comments: A. MENDOZA 04/14/23 3:11P.M.; Requesting Party: BAYMAN, MAXWELL STEPHEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketDescription: COURT SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/13/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HUNZIKER, SCOTT GARYT; Person Filing: T4V1 LLC (DBA CASA DEL SOL APARTMENTS) BY AND THROUGH ITS ATTORNEY OF;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2022

DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, AUSTIN BRUCE; Person Filing: VELOCITY RISK UNDERWRITERS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022

DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: VELOCITY RISK UNDERWRITERS MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 6/22/2022; Served: 6/23/2022; Tracking: 74019088; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HUNZIKER, SCOTT GARYT; Person Filing: CASA DEL SOL APARTMENTS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HUNZIKER, SCOTT GARYT; Person Filing: T4V1 LLC (DBA CASA DEL SOL APARTMENTS) BY AND THROUGH ITS ATTORNEY OF;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022

DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022

DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less