Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:38:46 (UTC).

SWN PRODUCTION COMPANY LLC vs. VELANDERA ENERGY PARTNERS LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 SWN PRODUCTION COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VELANDERA ENERGY PARTNERS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9471

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

SWN PRODUCTION COMPANY LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VELANDERA ENERGY PARTNERS

VELANDERA ENERGY PARTNERS LLC

Other

VELANDERA ENERGY PARTNERS LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY

5990 Haley Way

Frisco, TX 75034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TABOLSKY, MARC SAMUEL

700 Louisiana

Houston, TX 78701

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, COURT D.

1700 Legacy Dr.

Frisco, TX 75034

 

Court Documents

Citation (Valendera Energy Partners LLC)

04/24/2020: Citation (Valendera Energy Partners LLC)

Defendant Velandera Energy Partners LLCs Original Answer ,Affirmative Defenses and Request For Disclosure

05/11/2020: Defendant Velandera Energy Partners LLCs Original Answer ,Affirmative Defenses and Request For Disclosure

VELANDERA ENERGY PARTNERT LLCS ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST SWN PRODUCTION COMPANY LLC

05/20/2020: VELANDERA ENERGY PARTNERT LLCS ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST SWN PRODUCTION COMPANY LLC

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

05/29/2020: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit 01 - AAA Contract

03/26/2020: Exhibit 01 - AAA Contract

Plaintiff SWN Production Company, LLC's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

03/26/2020: Plaintiff SWN Production Company, LLC's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2021
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DOCKET CALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/29/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: SMITH, COURT D.; Person Filing: VELANDERA ENERGY PARTNERS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMITH, COURT D.; Person Filing: VELANDERA ENERGY PARTNERS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: VELANDERA ENERGY PARTNERS LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY; Issued: 3/26/2020; Served: 4/17/2020; Tracking: 73738447; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TABOLSKY, MARC SAMUEL; Person Filing: SWN PRODUCTION COMPANY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWN Production Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Court D Smith