This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/01/2022 at 07:30:20 (UTC).

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY vs. HIGHER UP CONSTRUCTION LLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HIGHER UP CONSTRUCTION LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1283

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

HIGHER UP CONSTRUCTION LLC

HOPSON, CARISSA

Bowie, TX 76230

HOPSON, JAMES D

Bowie, TX 76230

HOPSON, JOE RILEY

Fayetteville, NC 28303

Other

HIGHER UP CONSTRUCTION LLC (LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED

1300 Nugget St

Bowie, TX 76230

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS, JACKSON K.

 

Court Documents

Request for Issuance of Process

04/08/2022: Request for Issuance of Process

Request for Issuance of Process

04/08/2022: Request for Issuance of Process

Request for Issuance of Process

04/08/2022: Request for Issuance of Process

Request for Issuance of Process

04/08/2022: Request for Issuance of Process

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANYS ORIGINAL PETITION

04/07/2022: SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANYS ORIGINAL PETITION

EXHIBIT A

04/07/2022: EXHIBIT A

Return of Service

04/25/2022: Return of Service

Citation

04/20/2022: Citation

Citation

04/20/2022: Citation

Citation

04/20/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOPSON, JOE RILEY; Issued: 4/11/2022; Served: 4/19/2022; Tracking: 73993487; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOPSON, JAMES D; Issued: 4/11/2022; Tracking: 73993486; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOPSON, CARISSA; Issued: 4/11/2022; Served: 4/18/2022; Tracking: 73993484; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HIGHER UP CONSTRUCTION LLC (LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 4/11/2022; Served: 4/18/2022; Tracking: 73993479; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: THOMAS, JACKSON K.; Person Filing: SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant