Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:41:22 (UTC).

SUMMERWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. vs. BONNETTE, GERALD

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 SUMMERWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC filed an Other lawsuit against BONNETTE, GERALD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9496

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUMMERWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendants

BONNETTE, KAREN

Houston, TX 77044

BONNETTE, GERALD

Houston, TX 77044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAMISON, JOHN C

JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.

9821 Katy Freew

Houston, TX 77024

 

Court Documents

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

05/11/2020: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Citation(Gerald Bonnette)

04/07/2020: Citation(Gerald Bonnette)

Citation(Karen Bonnette)

04/07/2020: Citation(Karen Bonnette)

Defendant's Answer

04/17/2020: Defendant's Answer

Civil Process Request

03/26/2020: Civil Process Request

Civil Case Information Sheet

03/26/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/11/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: BONNETTE, GERALD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BONNETTE, KAREN; Issued: 3/30/2020; Tracking: 73738934; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BONNETTE, GERALD; Issued: 3/30/2020; Served: 4/1/2020; Tracking: 73738932; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.; Person Filing: SUMMERWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    Read MoreRead Less