This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 15:35:05 (UTC).

SUMMERS, REBA vs. THE KROGER CO

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 SUMMERS, REBA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3424

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUMMERS, REBA

Defendants

THE KROGER CO

KROGER TEXAS L P

Others

THE KROGER CO (OHIO CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

211 E 7Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

KROGER TEXAS L P (OHIO ENTITY) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUBERT, FELICIA MORRINE

Defendant Attorney

GREENE, ADRAON

 

Court Documents

Service Return

03/10/2022: Service Return

Citation

03/10/2022: Citation

Plaintiffs Original Petition

03/04/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Notice of Filing of Removal

04/07/2022: Notice of Filing of Removal

Exhibit A

04/07/2022: Exhibit A

Defendants The Kroger Co and Kroger Texas LP's Verified Denial and Original Answer

04/04/2022: Defendants The Kroger Co and Kroger Texas LP's Verified Denial and Original Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GREENE, ADRAON; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GREENE, ADRAON; Person Filing: THE KROGER CO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KROGER TEXAS L P (OHIO ENTITY) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 3/4/2022; Tracking: 73979901; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THE KROGER CO (OHIO CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 3/4/2022; Tracking: 73979900; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HUBERT, FELICIA MORRINE; Person Filing: SUMMERS, REBA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENE, ADRAON DELJOHN