Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:41:34 (UTC).

SUMMERLYN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. vs. WILSON, TAMMY

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 SUMMERLYN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC filed an Other lawsuit against WILSON, TAMMY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9498

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUMMERLYN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendants

WILSON, TAMMY

Houston, TX 77053

EAST, DENNIS

Houston, TX 77053

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAMISON, JOHN C

JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.

 

Court Documents

Citation Return

04/07/2020: Citation Return

Civil Process Request

03/26/2020: Civil Process Request

Civil Case Information Sheet

03/26/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EAST, DENNIS; Issued: 3/30/2020; Tracking: 73738767; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WILSON, TAMMY; Issued: 3/30/2020; Served: 3/31/2020; Tracking: 73738764; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.; Person Filing: SUMMERLYN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    Read MoreRead Less