Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:44:01 (UTC).

SUMMERLYN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC vs. RAZO, JUNIOR CANDE

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 SUMMERLYN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against RAZO, JUNIOR CANDE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN KIRKLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9520

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN KIRKLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUMMERLYN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

RAZO, JUNIOR CANDE

Houston, TX 77053

SANTOYO, MARIA M

Houston, TX 77053

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAMISON, JOHN C

JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.

9821 Katy Freew

Houston, TX 77024

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

06/03/2020: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

Proposed Order Granting Motion for Substitute Service Of Process On Defendant Junior Cande Razo:

06/03/2020: Proposed Order Granting Motion for Substitute Service Of Process On Defendant Junior Cande Razo:

Affidavit in Support of Motion For Alternate Service

06/03/2020: Affidavit in Support of Motion For Alternate Service

Motion for Substitute Service On Defendant, Junior Cande Razo:

06/03/2020: Motion for Substitute Service On Defendant, Junior Cande Razo:

CITATION: SANTOYO, MARIA M:

04/07/2020: CITATION: SANTOYO, MARIA M:

Civil Process Request

03/26/2020: Civil Process Request

Civil Case Information Sheet

03/26/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiffs Original Petition

03/26/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/3/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SANTOYO, MARIA M; Issued: 3/26/2020; Served: 3/31/2020; Tracking: 73738492; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RAZO, JUNIOR CANDE; Issued: 3/26/2020; Tracking: 73738491; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.; Person Filing: SUMMERLYN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less