This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/27/2021 at 18:28:09 (UTC).

STRICKLAND, WARREN CLAY vs. PURDUE PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS LP

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 STRICKLAND, WARREN CLAY filed an Other lawsuit against PURDUE PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS LP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0686

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRICKLAND, WARREN CLAY

Defendants

WALGREEN CO

PURDUE PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS LP

H E B LP

CVS PHARMACY INC

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC

ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

ALLERGAN PLC

ACTAVIS PLC

ACTAVIS INC

ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC

ACTAVIS LLC

ACTAVIS PHARMA INC

WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS INC

WATSON PHARMA INC

Others

PURDUE PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS LP (DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE

211 E 7Th #620

Austin, TX 78701

WALGREEN CO (ILLINOIS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

701 Brazos Street Suite 1050

Austin, TX 78701

CVS PHARMACY INC (RHODE ISLAND CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

1999 Bryan St #900

Dallas, TX 75201

H E B LP (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGITERED AGENT

646 South Flores St San

Antonio, TX 78204

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUSSLEWHITE, JEFFREY BENTON

1776 Yorktown

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

GRIFFIS, JOHN PHILIP

1322 Space Park

Houston, TX 77058

POWERS, JASON MICHAEL

1001 Fannin, Su

Houston, TX 77002

SCULLY, JOHN A.

900 Jackson St

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Original Answer

11/30/2020: Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Original Answer

DCA Generic Letter

11/30/2020: DCA Generic Letter

Defendant H-E-B, LP's Original Answer, Request for Disclosure, and Notice of Abatement

11/30/2020: Defendant H-E-B, LP's Original Answer, Request for Disclosure, and Notice of Abatement

Proposed Order Granting Pharmacy Defendants Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

01/04/2021: Proposed Order Granting Pharmacy Defendants Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

Pharmacy Defendants Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

01/04/2021: Pharmacy Defendants Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

Pharmacy Defendants Request for Oral Hearing on Rule 91A Motion

01/12/2021: Pharmacy Defendants Request for Oral Hearing on Rule 91A Motion

Pharmacy Defendants' Notice of Oral Hearing on Rule 91A Motion

01/22/2021: Pharmacy Defendants' Notice of Oral Hearing on Rule 91A Motion

151 Notice of Hearing (Oral)

01/25/2021: 151 Notice of Hearing (Oral)

Suggestion of Plaintiffs Death

02/22/2021: Suggestion of Plaintiffs Death

Plaintiff Warren Clay Strickland's First Amended Petition

03/01/2021: Plaintiff Warren Clay Strickland's First Amended Petition

Pharmacy Defendants Corrected Amended Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

03/05/2021: Pharmacy Defendants Corrected Amended Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

Proposed Order Granting Pharamacy Defendants Amended Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

03/05/2021: Proposed Order Granting Pharamacy Defendants Amended Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

Pharmacy Defendants Amended Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

03/05/2021: Pharmacy Defendants Amended Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

Proposed Order Granting Pharmacy Defendants Corrected Amended Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

03/05/2021: Proposed Order Granting Pharmacy Defendants Corrected Amended Rule 91A Motion to Dismiss

Pharmacy Defendants Notice of Oral Hearing on Corrected Amended Rule 91A Motion

03/05/2021: Pharmacy Defendants Notice of Oral Hearing on Corrected Amended Rule 91A Motion

Request for Issuance of Service

03/09/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/09/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/09/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: Dismissal; Results: Passed; Comments: CASE TRNSFRD TO THE 152ND; Requesting Party: POWERS, JASON MICHAEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY; Issued: 3/11/2021; Tracking: 73849147; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (OHIO); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CARDINAL HEALTH INC (OHIO CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 3/11/2021; Tracking: 73849146; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MCKESSON CORPORATION (DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 3/11/2021; Tracking: 73849145; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ACTAVIS PHARMA INC (DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 3/11/2021; Tracking: 73849144; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WATSON LABORATORIES INC (NEVADA CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 3/11/2021; Tracking: 73849143; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC (NEVADA CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 3/11/2021; Tracking: 73849142; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALLERGAN PLC (PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 3/11/2021; Tracking: 73849141; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCULLY, JOHN A.; Person Filing: CVS PHARMACY INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: POWERS, JASON MICHAEL; Person Filing: H E B LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS, CASE ON HOLD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRIFFIS, JOHN PHILIP; Person Filing: WALGREEN CO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: H E B LP (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGITERED AGENT; Issued: 11/4/2020; Tracking: 73807787; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CVS PHARMACY INC (RHODE ISLAND CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 11/4/2020; Tracking: 73807786; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WALGREEN CO (ILLINOIS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 11/4/2020; Tracking: 73807785; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PURDUE PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS LP (DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 11/4/2020; Tracking: 73807783; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MUSSLEWHITE, JEFFREY BENTON; Person Filing: STRICKLAND, WARREN CLAY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less