This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:14:07 (UTC).

STORAGE PARTNERS OF HIGHWAY 6 LP vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 STORAGE PARTNERS OF HIGHWAY 6 LP filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8229

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STORAGE PARTNERS OF HIGHWAY 6 LP

STORAGE PARTNERS OF BAYTOWN L P

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PENNELL, MARCIA FISHER

Defendant Attorney

MCCONNELL, ROBERT PATRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2006
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2006
  • PLAINTIFF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCCONNELL, ROBERT PATRICK Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PENNELL, MARCIA FISHER Person Filing - STORAGE PARTNERS OF BAYTOWN L P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PENNELL, MARCIA FISHER Person Filing - STORAGE PARTNERS OF HIGHWAY 6 LP

    Read MoreRead Less