This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/30/2022 at 08:01:23 (UTC).

STEWARD, CASSANDRA vs. METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 STEWARD, CASSANDRA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3647

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEWARD, CASSANDRA

Defendants

METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY

FIRST TRANSIT INC

FIRSTGROUP AMERICA INC

Others

METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY SERVING

1900 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

FIRST TRANSIT INC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

FIRSTGROUP AMERICA INC (A FOREIGH FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORDELL, BRENT MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

06/06/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

06/06/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

06/06/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

06/06/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Citation Return Executed

06/24/2022: Citation Return Executed

Citation Return Executed

06/23/2022: Citation Return Executed

Citation Return Executed

06/15/2022: Citation Return Executed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY SERVING; Issued: 6/10/2022; Served: 6/13/2022; Tracking: 74015611; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FIRST TRANSIT INC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 6/10/2022; Served: 6/14/2022; Tracking: 74015610; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FIRSTGROUP AMERICA INC (A FOREIGH FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 6/10/2022; Served: 6/14/2022; Tracking: 74015609; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CORDELL, BRENT MICHAEL; Person Filing: STEWARD, CASSANDRA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metropolitan Transit Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where FirstGroup America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST TRANSIT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORDELL, BRENT MICHAEL