This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:05:21 (UTC).

STEENERSON, ARNE vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 STEENERSON, ARNE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7536

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

WARREN PUMPS INC (CORPORATION)

ELLIOTT COMPANY

A W CHESTERTON CO

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION) (CORPORATION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (CORPORATION)

VIACOM INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION FKA

ANY AND ALL DEFENDANTS IN PLAINTIFF'S PETITION OR AMENDMENTS THERETO

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

ROACH, CRYSTAL

JACKSON, JESSICA S.

WHITE, CLAY M.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

HENDRYX, MICHAEL

MOIR, PETER A.

HARDING, LISA D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2014
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2007
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD Person Filing - D B RILEY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2007
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD Person Filing - RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2007
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD Person Filing - BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA D B RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KOEPKE, JOHN A. Person Filing - PRATT & WHITNEY (DIVISION OF UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LYNN, LAWRENCE A. Person Filing - FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2004
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - AMERICAN STANDARD INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - AMERICAN STANDARD INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, ROBERT L. Person Filing - CRANE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCLAURIN, KRISTIN ALIENE Person Filing - GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - SEATON, ELNER B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - RYAN, JAMES EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - VALETUTTO, DAVID MICHAEL Person Filing - SEATON, ELNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - STEENERSON, ARNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - STEENERSON, BOBBIE

    Read MoreRead Less