Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:35:12 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. ONE 2016 FORD MUSTANG

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE 2016 FORD MUSTANG. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9437

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

LOBEL FINANCIAL

HERRERA VILLATORO, JOSUE

Houston, TX 77084

ONE 2016 FORD MUSTANG

Other

LOBEL FINANCIAL (A CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEAVERS, ANGELA JEWEL

Defendant Attorney

GARZA, ERICON LEE

 

Court Documents

Respondent's Original Answer

05/04/2020: Respondent's Original Answer

Exhibit - Green Card and USPS Tracking

05/14/2020: Exhibit - Green Card and USPS Tracking

Exhibit - Certified Mail - Lobel Financial

05/14/2020: Exhibit - Certified Mail - Lobel Financial

Citation Return - Lobel Financial

05/14/2020: Citation Return - Lobel Financial

Notice of Appearance

05/15/2020: Notice of Appearance

Plaintiff's Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GARZA, ERICON LEE; Person Filing: HERRERA VILLATORO, JOSUE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HERRERA VILLATORO, JOSUE; Issued: 3/26/2020; Returned: 5/28/2020; Tracking: 73738417; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LOBEL FINANCIAL (A CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 3/26/2020; Served: 4/21/2020; Returned: 5/20/2020; Tracking: 73738416; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BEAVERS, ANGELA JEWEL; Person Filing: STATE OF TEXAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant