This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/16/2022 at 07:17:42 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. ONE 2016 DODGE CHALLENGER

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE 2016 DODGE CHALLENGER. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6470

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

ONE 2016 DODGE CHALLENGER

ZABALA, GABRIEL LUCIANO

Brookshire, TX 77423

ZABALA, LUIS ANTWAN

Brookshire, TX 77423

ALLY FINANCIAL

Other

ALLY FINANCIAL (A CORPORATION) CAN BE SERVED BY AND THROUGH ITS

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEAVERS, ANGELA JEWEL

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE

11/22/2022: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE

Envelope

12/05/2022: Envelope

Written Response

12/05/2022: Written Response

Written Response

12/05/2022: Written Response

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALLY FINANCIAL (A CORPORATION) CAN BE SERVED BY AND THROUGH ITS; Issued: 11/23/2022; Tracking: 74081665; Deliver To: CONSTABLE (DELIVERED BY DA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ZABALA, LUIS ANTWAN; Issued: 11/23/2022; Served: 11/30/2022; Returned: 11/30/2022; Tracking: 74081664; Deliver To: CONSTABLE (DELIVERED BY DA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ZABALA, GABRIEL LUCIANO; Issued: 11/23/2022; Served: 11/30/2022; Returned: 11/30/2022; Tracking: 74081660; Deliver To: CONSTABLE (DELIVERED BY DA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BEAVERS, ANGELA JEWEL; Person Filing: STATE OF TEXAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONE 2016 DODGE CHALLENGER is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEAVERS, ANGELA JEWEL