This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 07:50:17 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. ONE 2013 KIA RIO

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE 2013 KIA RIO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8023

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

ONE 2013 KIA RIO

ORELLANA, JOSE

MORALES, JOSE

Houston, TX 77067

GANAS YA

YA, GANAS (AKA TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP LLC)

TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP

Others

YA, GANAS (AKA TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP LLC (A CORPORATION) BY SERVING

Dallas, TX 75201

ORELLANA, JOSE BY AND THROUGH HIS NEXT FRIEND JOSE MORALES

Houston, TX 77067

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEAVERS, ANGELA JEWEL

Defendant Attorney

MARTINELLI, BRENT W.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture

06/24/2022: Plaintiffs Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture

Tricolor Auto Group's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture

07/07/2022: Tricolor Auto Group's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture

Citation (Seizure and Forfeiture) Return

06/30/2022: Citation (Seizure and Forfeiture) Return

Citation (Seizure and Forfeiture) Return

06/30/2022: Citation (Seizure and Forfeiture) Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MARTINELLI, BRENT W.; Person Filing: TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: YA, GANAS (AKA TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP LLC (A CORPORATION) BY SERVING; Issued: 6/24/2022; Tracking: 74020306; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MORALES, JOSE; Issued: 6/24/2022; Served: 6/29/2022; Returned: 6/29/2022; Tracking: 74020304; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ORELLANA, JOSE BY AND THROUGH HIS NEXT FRIEND JOSE MORALES; Issued: 6/24/2022; Served: 6/29/2022; Returned: 6/29/2022; Tracking: 74020302; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BEAVERS, ANGELA JEWEL; Person Filing: STATE OF TEXAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent W. Martinelli