Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/03/2015 at 20:56:03 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. ONE 2002 TOYOTA CAMRY VIN JTDBE32KX20080

Case Summary

On 10/29/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE 2002 TOYOTA CAMRY VIN JTDBE32KX20080. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9697

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

STATE OF TEXAS

THOMAS, ANNAMMA

ONE 2002 TOYOTA CAMRY VIN JTDBE32KX20080517

THOMAS, JERRY T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

WILLIAMS, QUENTIN TATE

MORRIS, KAREN L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2005
  • MULTIPLE PARTIES OR EXCEPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • REMOVED FROM ABATEMENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • ORDER LIFTING STAY SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ENTRY OF TEMPORARY ORDERS (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • CASE ABATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED STRIKING VISITING JUDGE (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED STRIKING VISITING JUDGE (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2003
  • ANSWER COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2003
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2003
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - WILLIAMS, QUENTIN TATE Person Filing - THOMAS, ANNAMMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILLIAMS, QUENTIN TATE Person Filing - THOMAS, ANNAMMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILLIAMS, QUENTIN TATE Person Filing - THOMAS, JERRY T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRIS, KAREN L.