Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/18/2015 at 08:42:49 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. ONE 2000 PONTIAC SUNFIRE VIN 1G2JB524XY7

Case Summary

On 12/19/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE 2000 PONTIAC SUNFIRE VIN 1G2JB524XY7. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8397

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

ONE 2000 PONTIAC SUNFIRE VIN 1G2JB524XY7343000

ONE 2000 LINCOLN NAVIGATOR VIN 5LMRU27A5YLJ14231

SILVA, GABRIEL

GONZALEZ, JESUS ZURIEL

WALD RELOCATION SERVICE LTD

M & L AUTO SALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorneys

STAMBAUGH, FRANK H.

SILVERMAN, NORMAN J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2006
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2006
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2006
  • INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2006
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2006
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2006
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2006
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • REMOVED FROM ABATEMENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • ORDER LIFTING STAY SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2004
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2004
  • CASE ABATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LIMITED NOTICE TO A PARTY (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2004
  • LIMITING NOTICE TO A PARTY GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STAMBAUGH, FRANK H. Person Filing - SILVA, GABRIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SILVERMAN, NORMAN J. Person Filing - GONZALEZ, JESUS ZURIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stambaugh, Frank H, Jr