Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/21/2015 at 13:10:44 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. ONE 2000 BUICK REGAL VIN 2G4WS52J1Y13581

Case Summary

On 02/28/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE 2000 BUICK REGAL VIN 2G4WS52J1Y13581. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0993

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

ONE 2000 BUICK REGAL VIN 2G4WS52J1Y1358145

MORALES, EUGENE

CISNEROS, RICHARD JR

CHEEK, TINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorney

GERSON, DAN B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2003
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2003
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GERSON, DAN B. Person Filing - CISNEROS, RICHARD JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less